House
|
03/20/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 32)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 34 -0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 16, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
to Licensing & Occupations (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 28, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|