House
|
03/31/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 164)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
passed 99-0
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 36-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
returned to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
taken from Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (2) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 08, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
to Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|