House
|
03/24/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 103)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
passed 88-0
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House concurred in Senate Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
taken from Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 36 -0 with Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 03, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
reassigned to Local Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|