House | 03/07/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | recommitted to Rules (H) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | taken from the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 03, 2023 | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | to Local Government (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | introduced in House |