House
|
03/29/2023
|
became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 125)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
passed 31-6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate receded from Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 16, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
taken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
returned to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
taken from Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 81-17 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 07, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|