Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 140)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
passed 29 -6
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
passed 81-17
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
veto overridden
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Vetoed
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
passed 83-14
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 25 -10 -1 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
returned to Agriculture (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
taken from Agriculture (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
to Agriculture (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 99-0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|