Senate | 03/16/2023 | 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | returned to Transportation (S) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | taken from Transportation (S) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | 1st reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | to Transportation (S) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 96-2 with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | recommitted to Rules (H) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | taken from the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 03, 2023 | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | to Education (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | introduced in House |