House | 03/16/2023 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | taken from the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | to Health Services (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | introduced in House |