CHAPTER 26 Legislative Research Commission PDF Version 1 CHAPTER 26 ( HB 442 ) AN ACT relating to authorizing the payment of certain claims against the state which have been duly audited and approved according to law and have not been paid because of the lapsing or insufficiency of former appropriations against which the claims were chargeable or the lack of an appropriate procurement document in place, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Kentucky: Section 1. There is appropriated out of the general fund, transportation fund, and federal funds in the State Treasury for the purpose of compensating persons and companies named below for claims which have been duly audited and approved according to law, but have not been paid because of lapsing or insufficiency of former appropriations against which the claims were chargeable, or the lack of an appropriate procurement document in place, the amounts listed below: Campbell Woods PLLC PO Box 1835 Huntington, West Virginia 25719-1835 $737.50 Center for Employment Security Education and Research 444 North Capitol Street, NW Suite 300 Washington, DC 20001-1512 $363.07 DNA Diagnostics Center Attn: Contract Services One DDC Way Fairfield, OH 45014-2281 $26,225.00 Eastern Aviation Fuels dba Titan Aviation Fuels PO Box 751211 Charlotte, NC 28275-1211 $52,188.33 EnSite LLC PO Box 175 Paducah, KY 42002 $300.00 EnSite LLC PO Box 175 Paducah, KY 42002 $940.00 Floyd County Fiscal Court PO Box 1600 Prestonsburg, KY 41653-5600 $392,387.45 George Freeman Gilbert 1041 Briarwood Way Lawrenceburg, KY 40342-9459 $2,875.00 Gilbert Barbee Moore McIlvoy ACTS OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY 2 dba Graves Gilbert Clinic PO Box 90007 Bowling Green, KY 42102-9007 $200.00 Jeffrey Herrington PO Box 1746 Lexington, KY 40588-1746 $500.00 National Center for Families Learning, Inc. 325 West Main Street, Suite 300 Louisville, KY 40202-4251 $32,112.74 NECCO, Inc. 1404 Race Street, Suite 302 Cincinnati, OH 45202-7366 $426,607.27 Oldham County EMS PO Box 589 Madisonville, KY 42431-5011 $8,807.29 Oldham County Fiscal Court 100 West Jefferson Street, Suite 4 Lagrange, KY 40031-1149 $62,459.26 Practical Actuarial Solutions, Inc. 12 North Main Street, Suite 10 West Harford, CT 06107-1936 $3,410.00 Sani-Tech JetVac Services PO Box 74028 Cleveland, OH 44194-4028 $115,200.50 Susan K. Lee dba Riverside Reporting 3238 Hildreth Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45211-6652 $293.25 Sweep All, Inc. PO Box 436051 Louisville, KY 40253-6051 $20,548.60 Tetra Tech, Inc. 250 West Court Street, Suite 200W Cincinnati, OH 45202-1072 $30,000.00 The Hon Company LLC PO Box 404422 Atlanta, GA 30384-4422 $1,599.40 United Parcel Service PO Box 809488 CHAPTER 26 Legislative Research Commission PDF Version 3 Chicago, IL 60680-9488 $410,801.51 University of Kentucky Research Foundation c/o PNC Bank PO Box 931113 Cleveland, OH 44193-1407 $36,386.00 University of Louisville Research Foundation Kent School of Social Work Oppenheimer Hall #110 Louisville, KY 40292 $181,134.00 Western Kentucky University 1906 College Heights Boulevard #11016 Bowling Green, KY 42101-1016 $2,875.00 Section 2. The claims listed below are for the payment of State Treasury checks payable to the persons or their personal representatives, and the firms listed, but not presented for payment within a period of five years from the date of issuance of such checks as required by KRS 41.370 and 413.120: Check #B1 11062863 dated July 1, 2010 23rd Street Investments, Inc. Attn: Jill Mayes 500 Schoolhouse Road Johnstown, PA 15904 $325.00 Check #BA 11112792 dated February 21, 2014 Beckman Coulter, Inc. Attn: C. A. Schwertner 200 Park Avenue Orange Village, OH 44122 $25,025.36 Check #TA 17012515 dated February 29, 2016 Bennett, Marcelita U. 4052 Jonesboro Road Metropolis, IL 62960 $132.00 Check #T1 4072575 dated March 1, 2006 Brenner, Megan L. 6531 Claymont Crossing Crestwood, KY 40014 $24.00 Check #T1 11771103 dated June 8, 2007 Chapman, Connie PO BOX 1076 Belfry, KY 41514 $8.00 Check #GA 18712727 dated January 24, 2014 City of Jackson ACTS OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY 4 Attn: Angie Combs 333 Broadway Jackson, KY 41339 $15,664.00 Check #TA 16678223 dated April 14, 2015 Clancey, Michael G. & Jose 308 Forest Lane Louisville, KY 40222 $840.00 Check #GA 21087689 dated December 14, 2016 Comfort Inn Glasgow 210 Cavalry Drive Glasgow, KY 42141 $258.96 Check #TA 16375941 dated February 12, 2015 Costa, Debra K. 103 Skipper Drive Frankfort, KY 40601 $141.00 Check #BA 11168088 dated August 4, 2017 Coty US, LLC Attn: Shari Thompson 2500 Broadway Road Sandford, NC 27330 $2,679.77 Check #BA 11168089 dated August 4, 2017 Coty US, LLC Attn: Shari Thompson 2500 Broadway Road Sandford, NC 27330 $4,578.65 Check #P1 12285330 dated June 15, 2010 Diana E. Wheeler 6147 Mistflower Circle Prospect, KY 40059 $2,820.10 Check #P1 12433928 dated December 22, 2010 Diana E. Wheeler 6147 Mistflower Circle Prospect, KY 40059 $2,815.93 Check #TA 17244539 dated April 26, 2016 Dmello, Ajay J. & Sarah 49 Walhalla Road Columbus, OH 43202 $114.00 Check #E1 11168168 dated May 5, 2008 Doll, John F. & Deborah L. CHAPTER 26 Legislative Research Commission PDF Version 5 9203 Foxtail Court Crestwood, KY 40014 $132.00 Check #T 6897817 dated May 18, 1999 Hatton, Mary A. 700 Lower Hines Creek Road Richmond, KY 40475 $485.55 Check #T1 13396208 dated October 7, 2009 Howerton, Lisa M. 2019 Player Place New Albany, IN 47150 $175.00 Check #BA 11079272 dated September 29, 2011 Infor Global Solutions Attn: Wesley Rails 4111 East 37th Street North Wichita, KS 67220 $1,035.54 Check #T1 0868690 dated May 17, 2002 Lewis, Clara 7301 Verona Way Louisville, KY 40218 $245.00 Check #B1 11042638 dated February 19, 2009 Metlife Capital LPDBA Attn: Jill Mayes 500 Schoolhouse Road Johnstown, PA 15904 $4,977.61 Check #B1 11066033 dated September 23, 2010 Metlife Capital LPDBA Attn: Jill Mayes 500 Schoolhouse Road Johnstown, PA 15904 $1,969.00 Check #GA 18278408 dated July 18, 2013 Microsoft Corp. Attn: Debra Remboldt 4668 42nd Street South Fargo, ND 58104 $1,018.99 Check #TA 17414056 dated February 16, 2017 Mohamed, Yusuf O. & M. I. 1127 South 6th Street Louisville, KY 40203 $449.00 ACTS OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY 6 Check #TA 16769804 dated May 7, 2015 Moser, Frederick D. & J. L. 27 Cedarview Drive Alexandria, KY 41001 $246.00 Check #BA 11154068 dated November 18, 2016 Pro Telligent, LLC Attn: Michael Lazar 3490 Piedmont Road, Suite 1025 Atlanta, GA 30305 $1,565.07 Check #TA 16805648 dated May 26, 2015 Ramsey, Calvin (Estate) Attn: Joyce L. Keeton (Administrator) 217 West Shelby Street Falmouth, KY 41040 $166.00 Check #GA 16831142 dated January 12, 2012 Ratterman, Thomas S. 3301 Natchez Lane Louisville, KY 40206 $119.20 Check #TA 16919638 dated February 22, 2016 Redd, James E. PO Box 1483 Eddyville, KY 42038 $411.00 Check #BA 11156784 dated January 12, 2017 Res Care, Inc. 805 North Whittington Parkway Louisville, KY $2,902.02 Check #TA 15697166 dated May 6, 2013 Rizk, Joseph 48 Marsh Hen Court Richmond Hill, GA 31324 $499.00 Check #GA 21493055 dated June 26, 2017 Robert Perry 402 West Main Avenue Bowling Green, KY 40508 $0.08 Check #TA 17370358 dated September 13, 2016 Ruff, Daniel L. PO Box 526150 Miami, FL 33152 $394.00 Check #TA 17375597 dated October 10, 2016 CHAPTER 26 Legislative Research Commission PDF Version 7 Sawyer, Kristina J. Attn: Kristina Ozcelik 60 Creekwood Drive, Unit 6 Wilder, KY 41071 $305.00 Check #TA 15878788 dated February 12, 2014 Spriggs, Melody 5152 Morrish Road #37 Swartz Creek, MI 48473 $149.00 Check #TA 17386388 dated November 4, 2016 Stowers, Margie (Dec'd) 364 Victory Lane Williamson, WV 25661 $147.00 Check #TA 16836169 dated July 17, 2015 Styke, Meghan 94 West Cooke Road Columbus, OH 43214 $411.00 Check #GA 17005312 dated March 14, 2012 Trimble Family Practice CHFS Redeposit 102 Athletic Drive Frankfort, KY 40601 $15.00 Check #G1 14999765 dated February 15, 2010 Unuakhalu, Michael F. Unclaimed Property Redeposit 1050 US 127 South, Suite 100 Frankfort, KY 40601 $2,844.66 Check #GA 21487641 dated June 22, 2017 Walter O'Donnell Estate Attn: Loretta O'Donnell (Executor) 172 Pleasant View Drive Hopkinsville, KY 42240 $1,752.83 Check #T1 12867527 dated February 19, 2009 White, Cathy A. 136 North Maple Street Richmond, KY 40475 $50.24 Section 3. Whereas, the persons and companies named above have furnished in good faith services, supplies, and materials and the Commonwealth has received the same, an emergency is declared to exist, and this Act takes effect upon its passage and approval by the Governor or upon its otherwise becoming a law. Signed by Governor March 20, 2023. ACTS OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY 8