Senate | 03/15/2023 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | taken from Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | received in Senate | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | 1st reading | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 97-1 with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | placed in the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | taken from Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | introduced in House |