Senate | 03/14/2023 | 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | 1st reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 03, 2023 | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | introduced in House |