Senate | 03/10/2023 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | received in Senate | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 28, 2023 | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | to Local Government (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | introduced in House |