House
|
03/20/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 27)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 33 -3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 91-5 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 07, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
returned to Local Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
taken from Local Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
to Local Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|