House
|
03/23/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 78)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
passed 98-0
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 36 -0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 16, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
returned to Health Services (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
taken from Health Services (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
to Health Services (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
returned to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
taken from Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
returned to Health Services (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
taken from Health Services (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
to Health Services (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|