House | 03/24/2023 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 89) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | delivered to Governor | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 32 -5 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | to Education (S) | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 81-12 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | to Education (H) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | introduced in House |