Kentucky 2023 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HB586 Introduced / Bill

                    UNOFFICIAL COPY  	23 RS BR 1751 
Page 1 of 4 
XXXX   2/22/2023 10:11 AM  	Jacketed 
AN ACT relating to workforce development. 1 
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Kentucky: 2 
Section 1.   KRS 151B.290 is amended to read as follows: 3 
(1) The Kentucky Education and Workforce Collaborative is hereby created for the 4 
purpose of ensuring the continued implementation of the Kentucky Workforce 5 
Innovation Board's strategic plan. 6 
(2) The Kentucky Education and Workforce Collaborative shall consist of the 7 
following twenty-one (21)[twenty (20)] members: 8 
(a) The Governor or his or her designee, who shall serve as chair; 9 
(b) The secretary of the Education and Labor Cabinet or his or her designee; 10 
(c) The secretary of the Cabinet for Health and Family Services or his or her 11 
designee; 12 
(d) The president of the Kentucky Community and Technical College System or 13 
his or her designee; 14 
(e) The president for the Council on Postsecondary Education or his or her 15 
designee; 16 
(f) The commissioner of the Kentucky Department of Education or his or her 17 
designee;  18 
(g) The president of the Kentucky Chamber of Commerce or his or her designee; 19 
(h) A representative of the board of directors from each of the Commonwealth's 20 
ten (10) local workforce development areas as selected by the board of 21 
directors; 22 
(i) A representative selected by the Kentucky Association of Counties; 23 
(j) A representative selected by the Kentucky Farm Bureau;[ and] 24 
(k) The chair of the Kentucky Workforce Innovation Board or his or her 25 
designee; and 26 
(l) The executive director/CEO of the Kentucky League of Cities or his or her 27  UNOFFICIAL COPY  	23 RS BR 1751 
Page 2 of 4 
XXXX   2/22/2023 10:11 AM  	Jacketed 
designee. 1 
(3) Meetings shall be held at least quarterly or at the call of the chair. 2 
(4) The Kentucky Education and Workforce Collaborative shall submit quarterly 3 
reports to the Legislative Research Commission summarizing its progress. 4 
(5) The Kentucky Education and Workforce Collaborative shall designate one (1) 5 
member as its legislative liaison to communicate with the General Assembly about 6 
the collaborative's progress and ensure that the work of the collaborative is separate 7 
and distinct from the work of the Kentucky Workforce Innovation Board. The 8 
liaison shall not be a member who is also a representative of a local workforce 9 
development area. 10 
(6) The Kentucky Education and Workforce Collaborative shall reach the following 11 
milestones and report findings, determinations, and procedures to the Kentucky 12 
Workforce Innovation Board: 13 
(a) Identification of all federal and state-funded workforce programs in the 14 
Commonwealth by September 30, 2023; 15 
(b) Development of a complete framework for implementation and transition by 16 
September 30, 2023; and 17 
(c) Evaluation and preparation of a determination of viability concerning the 18 
transfer of child-care services to local workforce development boards. 19 
(7) The Commonwealth shall reach the following milestones: 20 
(a) Procurement of a replacement for the UI and Case Management/Reporting 21 
System by December 31, 2023; and 22 
(b) Transition and consolidation of all federal and state workforce training, 23 
employment, and employment-related programs into one (1) entity that shall 24 
have primary responsibility for the operation of and management of funding 25 
for the newly created consolidated entity by December 31, 2023. 26 
(8) The local workforce development boards shall each reach the following milestones: 27  UNOFFICIAL COPY  	23 RS BR 1751 
Page 3 of 4 
XXXX   2/22/2023 10:11 AM  	Jacketed 
(a) By July 1, 2024, assumption of fiscal and administrative responsibilities for 1 
planning, oversight, and evaluation of all public workforce programs in the 2 
board's local workforce development area in the state. Each plan shall include: 3 
1. Governor-certified local workforce development boards to provide local 4 
control; 5 
2. Designated Kentucky Career Centers (KCCs) throughout the local 6 
workforce development area to provide the entire array of program 7 
services at each identified location; 8 
3. Integrated cross-program, functional service delivery systems to provide 9 
ease of access to local businesses and job seekers, with individual 10 
programs that are not apparent, but are defined by service requested by 11 
customer; and 12 
4. An emphasis on core competencies such that: 13 
a. Local workforce development boards are focused on fiscal and 14 
program administration; 15 
b. KCCs are focused on service delivery; and 16 
c. Educational entities are focused on providing data-driven, 17 
workforce preparation services and competencies; and 18 
5. Functional services that include but are not limited to business services, 19 
job search, group training and assessment services, intensive job search 20 
preparation, and training with case management; 21 
(b) By July 1, 2024, development of comprehensive system-wide budgets, 22 
strategic plans, implementation plans, supervision agreements with different 23 
programmatic employers, memoranda of understanding for the KCCs, and 24 
any infrastructure funding agreements required by the Workforce Innovation 25 
and Opportunity Act; and  26 
(c) By July 1, 2025, and annually thereafter, preparation and transmission of a 27  UNOFFICIAL COPY  	23 RS BR 1751 
Page 4 of 4 
XXXX   2/22/2023 10:11 AM  	Jacketed 
report to the Kentucky Education and Workforce Collaborative and Kentucky 1 
Workforce Innovation Board, detailing its attainment of the policies and goals 2 
contained in the Governor's current executive order issued pursuant to the 3 
Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act. 4