Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HB586 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version

                            CHAPTER 90 
Legislative Research Commission PDF Version 
 
1 
CHAPTER 90 
( HB 586 ) 
AN ACT relating to workforce development. 
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Kentucky: 
Section 1.   KRS 151B.290 is amended to read as follows: 
(1) The Kentucky Education and Workforce Collaborative is hereby created for the purpose of ensuring the 
continued implementation of the Kentucky Workforce Innovation Board's strategic plan. 
(2) The Kentucky Education and Workforce Collaborative shall consist of the following twenty-one (21)[twenty 
(20)] members: 
(a) The Governor or his or her designee, who shall serve as chair; 
(b) The secretary of the Education and Labor Cabinet or his or her designee; 
(c) The secretary of the Cabinet for Health and Family Services or his or her designee; 
(d) The president of the Kentucky Community and Technical College System or his or her designee; 
(e) The president for the Council on Postsecondary Education or his or her designee; 
(f) The commissioner of the Kentucky Department of Education or his or her designee;  
(g) The president of the Kentucky Chamber of Commerce or his or her designee; 
(h) A representative of the board of directors from each of the Commonwealth's ten (10) local workforce 
development areas as selected by the board of directors; 
(i) A representative selected by the Kentucky Association of Counties; 
(j) A representative selected by the Kentucky Farm Bureau;[ and] 
(k) The chair of the Kentucky Workforce Innovation Board or his or her designee; and 
(l) The executive director/CEO of the Kentucky League of Cities or his or her designee. 
(3) Meetings shall be held at least quarterly or at the call of the chair. 
(4) The Kentucky Education and Workforce Collaborative shall submit quarterly reports to the Legislative 
Research Commission summarizing its progress. 
(5) The Kentucky Education and Workforce Collaborative shall designate one (1) member as its legislative liaison 
to communicate with the General Assembly about the collaborative's progress and ensure that the work of the 
collaborative is separate and distinct from the work of the Kentucky Workforce Innovation Board. The liaison 
shall not be a member who is also a representative of a local workforce development area. 
(6) The Kentucky Education and Workforce Collaborative shall reach the following milestones and report 
findings, determinations, and procedures to the Kentucky Workforce Innovation Board: 
(a) Identification of all federal and state-funded workforce programs in the Commonwealth by September 
30, 2023; 
(b) Development of a complete framework for implementation and transition by September 30, 2023; and 
(c) Evaluation and preparation of a determination of viability concerning the transfer of child-care services 
to local workforce development boards. 
(7) The Commonwealth shall reach the following milestones: 
(a) Procurement of a replacement for the UI and Case Management/Reporting System by December 31, 
2023; and 
(b) Transition and consolidation of all federal and state workforce training, employment, and employment-
related programs into one (1) entity that shall have primary responsibility for the operation of and 
management of funding for the newly created consolidated entity by December 31, 2023.  ACTS OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY 2 
(8) The local workforce development boards shall each reach the following milestones: 
(a) By July 1, 2024, assumption of fiscal and administrative responsibilities for planning, oversight, and 
evaluation of all public workforce programs in the board's local workforce development area in the 
state. Each plan shall include: 
1. Governor-certified local workforce development boards to provide local control; 
2. Designated Kentucky Career Centers (KCCs) throughout the local workforce development area 
to provide the entire array of program services at each identified location; 
3. Integrated cross-program, functional service delivery systems to provide ease of access to local 
businesses and job seekers, with individual programs that are not apparent, but are defined by 
service requested by customer; and 
4. An emphasis on core competencies such that: 
a. Local workforce development boards are focused on fiscal and program administration; 
b. KCCs are focused on service delivery; and 
c. Educational entities are focused on providing data-driven, workforce preparation services 
and competencies; and 
5. Functional services that include but are not limited to business services, job search, group 
training and assessment services, intensive job search preparation, and training with case 
management; 
(b) By July 1, 2024, development of comprehensive system-wide budgets, strategic plans, implementation 
plans, supervision agreements with different programmatic employers, memoranda of understanding for 
the KCCs, and any infrastructure funding agreements required by the Workforce Innovation and 
Opportunity Act; and  
(c) By July 1, 2025, and annually thereafter, preparation and transmission of a report to the Kentucky 
Education and Workforce Collaborative and Kentucky Workforce Innovation Board, detailing its 
attainment of the policies and goals contained in the Governor's current executive order issued pursuant 
to the Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act. 
Signed by Governor March 24, 2023.