House
|
03/16/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 4)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
passed 29-6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Floor Amendment (1) withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
returned to Licensing & Occupations (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
taken from Licensing & Occupations (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
to Licensing & Occupations (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
returned to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
taken from Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
passed 64-32 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute , floor amendment (4-title) filed to bill
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
taken from table
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
floor amendment adopted Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Committee Substitute adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|