House | 03/16/2023 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | taken from Rules (H) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | introduced in House |