Senate | 03/09/2023 | to Licensing & Occupations (S) | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 28, 2023 | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | to State Government (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | introduced in House |