Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HB90 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                            UNOFFICIAL COPY  	23 RS BR 934 
Page 1 of 3 
XXXX   12/29/2022 1:52 PM  	Jacketed 
AN ACT relating to governmental agencies, making an appropriation therefor, and 1 
declaring an emergency. 2 
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Kentucky: 3 
Section 1.   The General Fund appropriation of $200,000,000 in fiscal year 2023-4 
2024 set out in 2022 Ky. Acts ch. 199, Part I, N., 1. is hereby transferred as follows: 5 
(1) $179,500,000 to the State Salary and Compensation Fund budget unit within 6 
the Personnel Cabinet in fiscal year 2023-2024 for a six percent salary increase for state 7 
employees, salary increases associated with grade changes resulting from findings of the 8 
Personnel Cabinet’s classification review process, and salary changes related to the 9 
conversion of all state employees currently working a 37.5-hour week to a 40-hour work 10 
week, effective July 2, 2023. Notwithstanding KRS 18A.335, relating to anniversary 11 
date, and notwithstanding KRS 156.808(6)(e) and 163.032(1), a six percent salary 12 
increase is provided, effective July 1, 2023, on the base salary or wages of each eligible 13 
state employee. For these purposes, there is hereby appropriated Restricted Funds in the 14 
amount of $60,500,000 in fiscal year 2023-2024 to the State Salary and Compensation 15 
Fund budget unit within the Personnel Cabinet. The State Budget Director shall 16 
determine the necessary amount of funds from these appropriations, by budget unit. The 17 
State Budget Director shall notify the Secretary of the Finance and Administration 18 
Cabinet of the respective amounts from the Fund to transfer to each affected budget unit. 19 
The State Budget Director shall report to the Interim Joint Committee on Appropriations 20 
and Revenue on the implementation of this provision by December 1, 2023; 21 
(2) $20,000,000 to the Kentucky Higher Education Assistance Authority budget 22 
unit in fiscal year 2023-2024 for a student loan forgiveness program for state employees. 23 
The Personnel Cabinet, in cooperation with the Kentucky Higher Education Assistance 24 
Authority, shall establish the terms and conditions for the program. Notwithstanding KRS 25 
45.229, these funds shall not lapse and shall carry forward; and 26 
(3) $500,000 in fiscal year 2023-2024 to the General Operations budget unit 27  UNOFFICIAL COPY  	23 RS BR 934 
Page 2 of 3 
XXXX   12/29/2022 1:52 PM  	Jacketed 
within the Personnel Cabinet to provide additional contractual resources to complete the 1 
job classification reviews. 2 
Section 2.   In accordance with KRS 61.691(2)(a)2., there is hereby appropriated 3 
General Fund moneys in the amount of $162,000,000 in fiscal year 2023-2024 to the 4 
Kentucky Public Pensions Authority to be applied to the Kentucky Employees 5 
Retirement Fund of the Kentucky Employees Retirement System established by KRS 6 
61.515 to prefund, effective July 1, 2023, a one and one-half percent increase in the 7 
monthly retirement allowances paid from the Kentucky Employees Retirement System to 8 
each recipient for service in a nonhazardous position who has retired as of July 1, 2022. 9 
Section 3.   In accordance with KRS 61.691(2)(a)2., there is hereby appropriated 10 
General Fund moneys in the amount of $12,000,000 in fiscal year 2023-2024 to the 11 
Kentucky Public Pensions Authority to be applied to the Kentucky Employees 12 
Retirement Fund of the Kentucky Employees Retirement System established by KRS 13 
61.515 to prefund, effective July 1, 2023, a one and one-half percent increase in the 14 
monthly retirement allowances paid from the Kentucky Employees Retirement System to 15 
each recipient for service in a hazardous position as provided in KRS 61.592 who has 16 
retired as of July 1, 2022. 17 
Section 4.   In accordance with KRS 61.691(2)(a)2., there is hereby appropriated 18 
General Fund moneys in the amount of $12,000,000 in fiscal year 2023-2024 to the 19 
Kentucky Public Pensions Authority to be applied to the State Police Retirement Fund of 20 
the State Police Retirement System established by KRS 16.510 to prefund, effective July 21 
1, 2023, a one and one-half percent increase in the monthly retirement allowances paid 22 
from the State Police Retirement System to each recipient for service as provided in KRS 23 
16.510 who has retired as of July 1, 2022. 24 
Section 5.   There is hereby appropriated General Fund moneys in the amount of 25 
$100,000,000 in fiscal year 2022-2023 to the Kentucky Public Pensions Authority budget 26 
unit to be applied to the unfunded pension liability of the Kentucky Employees 27  UNOFFICIAL COPY  	23 RS BR 934 
Page 3 of 3 
XXXX   12/29/2022 1:52 PM  	Jacketed 
Retirement System Nonhazardous pension fund. 1 
Section 6.   There is hereby appropriated General Fund moneys in the amount of 2 
$100,000,000 in fiscal year 2022-2023 to the Kentucky Teachers’ Retirement System 3 
budget unit to be applied to the unfunded pension liability of the Kentucky Teachers 4 
Retirement System. 5 
Section 7. There is hereby appropriated Restricted Funds in the amount of 6 
$1,400,000 in fiscal year 2023-2024 to the General Operations budget unit within the 7 
Personnel Cabinet to provide adequate staffing for the administration of the 8 
Commonwealth’s employment application process, management of classification and 9 
compensation system, and the administration of the statewide Performance Management 10 
Program. 11 
Section 8.   Whereas the operations of governmental agencies are imperative for 12 
the betterment of the Commonwealth, an emergency is declared to exist, and this Act 13 
takes effect upon its passage and approval by the Governor or upon its otherwise 14 
becoming a law. 15