House | 03/27/2023 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 112) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | delivered to Governor | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 35-1 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | returned to Transportation (S) | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | taken from Transportation (S) | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | 1st reading | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | to Transportation (S) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | received in Senate | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | 3rd reading, adopted 93-0 | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 16, 2023 | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | to Transportation (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | introduced in House |