House
|
03/27/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 113)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
3rd reading, adopted 34 -0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 16, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 94-0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 08, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
to Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|