Senate | 03/30/2023 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | 3rd reading, adopted 96-0 | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | placed in the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | taken from Rules | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | reported favorably, to Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | 2nd reading | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | returned to Local Government (H) | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | taken from Local Government (H) | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | 1st reading | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | to Local Government (H) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | introduced in House |