Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HJR21 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                            UNOFFICIAL COPY  	23 RS BR 1194 
Page 1 of 1 
XXXX   1/30/2023 12:00 PM  	Jacketed 
A JOINT RESOLUTION designating the Private Dennie Lee Story Memorial 1 
Highway in Fleming County. 2 
WHEREAS, Dennie Lee Story was born to Marion Story and Sallie Martha Story in 3 
Grange City, Fleming County, on November 8, 1894; and 4 
WHEREAS, Dennie Lee Story grew up roaming the fields and creeks of Fleming 5 
County in his youth. He was drafted into military service to his country in World War I, 6 
beginning on April 29, 1918; and 7 
WHEREAS, Private Dennie Lee Story of the United States Army was set to sail 8 
away to Europe from New York City when he turned around to a friend standing on the 9 
dock and tossed one of his two silver dollars down to him and exclaimed, "I won't need 10 
this where I'm going"; and 11 
WHEREAS, tragically, on October 23, 1918, Private Dennie Lee Story was killed 12 
in France during the Meuse-Argonne offensive, just weeks before the ceasefire ending 13 
the war on November 11, 1918; and 14 
WHEREAS, after a long journey home, Private Dennie Lee Story was laid to rest in 15 
the Hillsboro Cemetery, becoming the first soldier from World War I interred there; and 16 
WHEREAS, this designation shall serve as a constant reminder of the ultimate 17 
sacrifice Private Dennie Lee Story made for the Commonwealth and the nation; 18 
NOW, THEREFORE, 19 
Be it resolved by the General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Kentucky: 20 
Section 1.   The Transportation Cabinet shall designate a portion of Kentucky 21 
Route 111 in Fleming County, from its intersection with Hot Shot Road to its intersection 22 
with Saunders Lane, as the "Private Dennie Lee Story Memorial Highway" and shall, 23 
within 30 days of the effective date of this Resolution, erect signage denoting this 24 
designation. 25