Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HJR23 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                            UNOFFICIAL COPY  	23 RS BR 1116 
Page 1 of 2 
XXXX   2/6/2023 10:36 AM  	Jacketed 
A JOINT RESOLUTION designating a portion of Kentucky Route 878 in Ohio 1 
County in honor and memory of Private Millard R. Hurt.  2 
WHEREAS, Millard R. Hurt, a native of Ohio County, was born on January 29, 3 
1920, to the late Claud Hurt and Leflie White Hurt; and 4 
WHEREAS, Millard R. Hurt married Verna Mae Duggins Hurt on December 12, 5 
1941; and 6 
WHEREAS, Millard R. Hurt served in the United States Army during World War 7 
II, enlisting as a private in the 28th Infantry Division, 110th Infantry Regiment, Company 8 
B, on October 25, 1943; and 9 
WHEREAS, Private Millard R. Hurt fought in the Battle of the Bulge where he was 10 
taken as a prisoner of war by the Germans; and 11 
WHEREAS, Private Millard R. Hurt was a prisoner of war at the Stalag 9B Prisoner 12 
of War Camp, located near the town of Bad Orb in Hesse, Germany, from December 20, 13 
1944, until May 2, 1945; and 14 
WHEREAS, Private Millard R. Hurt served with honor and valor during World 15 
War II; and 16 
WHEREAS, when Private Millard R. Hurt was discharged from service on 17 
November 18, 1945, he returned to Ohio County where he worked and retired from the 18 
Illinois Central Railroad; and 19 
WHEREAS, Millard R. Hurt was involved in his community as an active member 20 
of the Lion's Club and the VFW of Owensboro and spent many hours in the planning and 21 
construction of the Veteran's Home in Hanson, Kentucky, as well as other activities that 22 
the VFW was responsible for; and 23 
WHEREAS, Millard R. Hurt died on November 14, 2008, in Ohio County; and 24 
WHEREAS, Ohio County Judge/Executive David Johnston has expressed support 25 
for designating a portion of Kentucky Route 878 in honor and memory of Millard R. 26 
Hurt; and 27  UNOFFICIAL COPY  	23 RS BR 1116 
Page 2 of 2 
XXXX   2/6/2023 10:36 AM  	Jacketed 
WHEREAS, this highway designation will serve as a reminder of Private Millard R. 1 
Hurt's life, sacrifice, and dedication to our nation; 2 
NOW, THEREFORE, 3 
Be it resolved by the General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Kentucky: 4 
Section 1.   The Transportation Cabinet shall designate Kentucky Route 878 in 5 
Ohio County, from the beginning of Kentucky Route 878, from Kentucky Route 69 at 6 
mile point 0 to mile point 7.485 at the Ohio/Grayson County line as the "Pvt. Millard R. 7 
Hurt Memorial Highway," and shall, within 30 days of the effective date of this 8 
Resolution, erect the appropriate signage. 9