House
|
03/21/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 43)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
passed 97-0
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 16, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
returned to Transportation (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
taken from Transportation (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
to Transportation (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 02, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
to Transportation (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|