House
|
03/23/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 83)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 36-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
returned to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
taken from Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (4)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
floor amendments (1), (2) and (3) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
floor amendments (1), (2), (3) and (4) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 03, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|