House | 03/16/2023 | adopted by voice vote with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | to House Floor | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | taken from Rules | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | to Transportation (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | introduced in House |