Senate
|
01/06/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
passed 98-0
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
2nd and 3rd readings dispensed with
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
substituted for identical House Bill 10
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
to Small Business & Information Technology (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 35-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 05, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
taken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2023
|
to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2023
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|