House | 03/15/2023 | 2nd reading | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | returned to State Government (H) | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | taken from State Government (H) | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | 1st reading | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | to State Government (H) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 30-6 with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | floor amendment withdrawn Floor Amendment (1) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | introduced in Senate |