House
|
03/29/2023
|
delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 134)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
passed 78-19
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
passed 30 -7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
veto overridden
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Vetoed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
passed 29 -6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 80-20 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
returned to Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
taken from Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
to Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 29-4 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (1), and committee amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|