Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Vetoed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 91-6
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
floor amendments (2), (3) and (4-title) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
returned to Banking & Insurance (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
taken from Banking & Insurance (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
to Banking & Insurance (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 34 -0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 03, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
to Banking & Insurance (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|