Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 51)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
passed 33-3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (2) and Floor Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendments (1-title) and (2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 91-0 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (2) and Floor Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
floor amendment (1-title) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
returned to Health Services (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
taken from Health Services (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
to Health Services (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 35 -0-1 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 01, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
to Health Services (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|