House | 03/16/2023 | returned to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | 1st reading | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | taken from Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | passed 26 -6 -1 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (2) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | floor amendment defeated Floor Amendments (1) and (3) | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | floor amendments (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | introduced in Senate |