House
|
03/29/2023
|
delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 135)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
passed 77-17
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
passed 29 -8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
veto overridden
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Vetoed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
passed 27-8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 74-20 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 29-5-1 with Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|