Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 93)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
passed 37-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 80-17 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
to Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 35 -0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 08, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|