House | 03/10/2023 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | 2nd reading | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | returned to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | taken from Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | 1st reading | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Floor Amendment (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | introduced in Senate |