Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 129)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
passed 32-2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate concurred in House floor amendments (1), (3) and (4-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Floor Amendments (1), (3) and (4-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 87-12 with Floor Amendments (1) and (3) and Floor Amendment (4-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
floor amendments (3) and (4-title) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 09, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
to Transportation (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 35-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
to Transportation (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|