Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 72)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 97-0
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
returned to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
taken from Natural Resources & Energy (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 35 -0 with Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 07, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|