House | 03/29/2023 | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 138) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | passed 79-18 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | taken from Rules | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | to Rules (H) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | passed 31 -6 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | veto overridden | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | to Rules (S) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | received in Senate | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Vetoed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | delivered to Governor | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 78-20 | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 30-6 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | introduced in Senate |