Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 107)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
passed 36-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Floor Amendments (1) and (2) and Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 91-6 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
returned to Families & Children (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
taken from Families & Children (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
to Families & Children (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 34 -0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 03, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
to Families & Children (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|