Senate | 03/22/2023 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 56) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | to Education (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | received in House | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 14, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
Senate | 01/05/2023 | to Education (S) | ||
Senate | 01/03/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/03/2023 | introduced in Senate |