Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 179)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 97-0
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 34 -0 with Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
reassigned to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|