Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 173)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 99-0
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
to Judiciary (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 33 -0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
to Judiciary (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|