Senate | 04/11/2023 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 189) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | placed in the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | taken from Rules | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | reported favorably, to Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | 2nd reading | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | returned to Local Government (H) | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | taken from Local Government (H) | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | 1st reading | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | to Local Government (H) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | received in House | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 21, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 01/06/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/06/2023 | introduced in Senate |