Senate | 03/02/2023 | recommitted to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | introduced in Senate |