House
|
03/29/2023
|
delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 137)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
passed 75-20
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
passed 30 -7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
veto overridden
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Vetoed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
passed 31 -6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Free Conference Committee report filed in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
passed 70-19
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Free Conference Committee report adopted in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Free Conference Committee report filed in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
posted for passage for receding from House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Senate refused to concur in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 72-19 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 10, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 29-5 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|