Kentucky 2023 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SB65 Chaptered / Bill

                    CHAPTER 137 
Legislative Research Commission PDF Version 
 
1 
CHAPTER 137 
( SB 65 ) 
AN ACT relating to deficient administrative regulations and declaring an emergency. 
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Kentucky: 
SECTION 1.   A NEW SECTION OF KRS CHAPTER 13A IS CREATED TO READ AS FOLLOWS: 
(1) The General Assembly finds that 803 KAR 1:006, Employer-Employee Relationship, was found deficient 
but became effective notwithstanding the finding of deficiency pursuant to KRS 13A.330, on or after April 
14, 2022, and before March 30, 2023, as evidenced by records of the Legislative Research Commission. 
(2) Contrary provisions of any section of the Kentucky Revised Statutes notwithstanding, the administrative 
regulation referenced in subsection (1) of this section, including any subsequently filed amendment, shall 
be null, void, and unenforceable as of the effective date of this Act. 
(3) Contrary provisions of any section of the Kentucky Revised Statutes notwithstanding, the administrative 
body shall be prohibited from promulgating an administrative regulation that is identical to, or substantially 
the same as, the administrative regulation referenced in subsection (1) of this section for a period beginning 
on January 3, 2023, and concluding on June 1, 2024. 
(4) The administrative regulation referenced in subsection (1) of this section shall be available to the public, in 
the office of the Legislative Research Commission's regulations compiler. 
SECTION 2.   A NEW SECTION OF KRS CHAPTER 13A IS CREATED TO READ AS FOLLOWS: 
(1) The General Assembly finds that proposed emergency and ordinary amendments of the following 
administrative regulations were found deficient pursuant to KRS 13A.030, on or after April 14, 2022, and 
before March 30, 2023, as evidenced by the records of the Legislative Research Commission: 
(a) 907 KAR 1:026, Dental Services’ Coverage Provisions and Requirements; 
(b) 907 KAR 1:038, Hearing Program Coverage Provisions and Requirements; and 
(c) 907 KAR 1:632, Vision Program Coverage Provisions and Requirements. 
(2) Contrary provisions of any section of the Kentucky Revised Statutes notwithstanding: 
(a) The proposed emergency amendments referenced in subsection (1) of this section shall be null, void, 
and unenforceable as of the effective date of this Act; and 
(b) 1. If the proposed ordinary amendments referenced in subsection (1) of this section have not 
been adopted on or before the effective date of this Act, the proposed ordinary amendments 
shall expire as of the effective date of this Act; or  
2. If the proposed ordinary amendments referenced in subsection (1) of this section have been 
adopted on or before the effective date of this Act, the administrative regulations, including 
any subsequently filed amendments, shall be null, void, and unenforceable as of the effective 
date of this Act. 
(3) Contrary provisions of any section of the Kentucky Revised Statutes notwithstanding, the administrative 
body shall be prohibited from promulgating administrative regulations that are identical to, or substantially 
the same as, the proposed amendments referenced in subsection (1) of this section for a period beginning 
on January 3, 2023, and concluding on June 1, 2024. 
(4) The proposed amendments referenced in subsection (1) of this section shall be available to the public, in the 
office of the Legislative Research Commission's regulations compiler. 
SECTION 3.   A NEW SECTION OF KRS CHAPTER 13A IS CREATED TO READ AS FOLLOWS: 
(1) The General Assembly finds that the proposed emergency amendment of 201 KAR 2:380, Board Authorized 
Protocols, was found deficient pursuant to KRS 13A.030, on or after April 14, 2022, and before March 30, 
2023, as evidenced by the records of the Legislative Research Commission.  ACTS OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY 2 
(2) Contrary provisions of any section of the Kentucky Revised Statutes notwithstanding, the proposed 
emergency amendment referenced in subsection (1) of this section shall be null, void, and unenforceable as 
of the effective date of this Act. 
(3) Contrary provisions of any section of the Kentucky Revised Statutes notwithstanding, the administrative 
body shall be prohibited from promulgating an administrative regulation that is identical to, or substantially 
the same as, the proposed emergency amendment referenced in subsection (1) of this section for a period 
beginning on January 3, 2023, and concluding on June 1, 2024. 
(4) The proposed emergency amendment referenced in subsection (1) of this section shall be available to the 
public, in the office of the Legislative Research Commission's regulations compiler. 
Section 4.   The Department for Medicaid Services shall reimburse providers utilizing the fee schedule in 
effect as of January 1, 2023, for services rendered or initiated prior to the effective date of this Act. Nothing in 
Section 2 of this Act shall be construed to prohibit or prevent the Department for Medicaid Services from covering 
the services that were initiated prior to the effective date of this Act. 
Section 5.   Nothing in Section 2 of this Act shall be construed to prohibit or prevent the Department for 
Medicaid Services from increasing reimbursement rates after the effective date of this Act for the dental, hearing, and 
vision services that were covered before January 1, 2023. 
Section 6.   Whereas it is crucial that the Commonwealth's regulatory policy reflect the statutory intent of 
the General Assembly, an emergency is declared to exist, and this Act takes effect upon its passage and approval by 
the Governor or upon its otherwise becoming a law. 
Veto Overridden March 29, 2023.