Senate | 03/07/2023 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | recommitted to Licensing & Occupations (S) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | floor amendments (2), (3), (4), (5), (6), (7), (8), (9), (10) and (11) filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | to Licensing & Occupations (S) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | introduced in Senate |